This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:50:59 (UTC).

Shields v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Shields filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00978

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Clay Shields

Defendants

John Crane Inc.

3M Company

Ashland LLC

Champlain Cable Corporation

Elliott Company

Flowserve Corporation

Hercules LLC

ITT Corporation

Riley Power Inc

Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC

Viacomcbs Inc

John Crane Inc

Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing CO

4520 Corporation Inc

Able Supply Co

Ametek Inc

Ashland Inc

BW/IP International Inc

Champion Oil Company

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5489 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Steven Scott Schulte

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorney

Laura E Kugler

Attorney at Gordon Reese Scully & Mansukhani

2200 Ross Ave., Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by John Crane Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12794727) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Crane Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Crane Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition filed by John Crane Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Clay Shields with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Steven Scott Schulte added to party Robert Clay Shields(pty:pla) (Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Clay Shields re #6 MOTION to Remand (Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER re: #6 Motion to Remand. Because this Court does not have subject- matter jurisdiction, Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the 134th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), 144l(a). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/24/2022) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (oyh) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

9 #1

Remand Letter

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re: #6 Motion to Remand. Because this Court does not have subject- matter jurisdiction, Plaintiffs Motion is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the 134th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. See 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), 144l(a). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/24/2022) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (oyh) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court GRANTS #5 Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. The deadline for Defendant John Crane Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition is extended to June 19, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/23/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Clay Shields re #6 MOTION to Remand (Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand filed by Robert Clay Shields with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Steven Scott Schulte added to party Robert Clay Shields(pty:pla) (Schulte, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition filed by John Crane Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Crane Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Crane Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by John Crane Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12794727) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Kugler, Laura) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hercules LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASHLAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Blount International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant