This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2021 at 08:49:03 (UTC).

Shields v. Hagan et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Shields filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Hagan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard W. Story, J. Clay Fuller and Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

Presiding Judges

Richard W. Story

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bobby Germaine Shields

Dawsonville, GA 30534

Defendants

Jason Hagan

Judge Anthony Tarnacki

Corporal Jane Czajkoski

Officer Gowdy

Deputy Jacobson

Jeff Johnson

Public Defender Office

Dr. Moore

Lt. Teressa Kirby

Andrew Loving Good

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-00211-SCJ-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/27/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Bobby Germaine Shields re #5 Order Reassigning Case. (rsg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:21-cv-00211-SCJ-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/27/2021. (rsg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (aar) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00147. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER transferring this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/21/2021. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Germaine Shields. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bobby Germaine Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER is a litigant

Latest cases where Moore is a litigant