This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 08:05:03 (UTC).

SHIELDS v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 SHIELDS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman, Jane Magnus-Stinson, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04333

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Matthew P. Brookman

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judges

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Richard L. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAREN LOUISE SHIELDS

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David P. Matthews

Attorney at MATTHEWS & ASSOCIATES

2905 Sackett Street

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04231-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04333-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04334-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04335-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04336-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04379-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04380-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04381-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04447-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04475-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04476-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04549-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04553-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04608-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04614-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04620-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04630-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04637-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04653-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04683-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04684-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04690-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04793-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04231-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04333-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04334-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04335-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04336-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04379-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04380-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04381-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04447-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04475-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04476-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04549-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04553-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04608-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04614-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04620-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04630-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04637-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04653-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04683-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04684-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04690-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04793-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by KAREN LOUISE SHIELDS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5693431) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matthews, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson and Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4333-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Matthews on behalf of Plaintiff KAREN LOUISE SHIELDS. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/30/2019. (LBT) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04231-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04333-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04334-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04335-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04336-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04379-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04380-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04381-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04447-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04475-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04476-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04549-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04553-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04608-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04614-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04620-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04630-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04637-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04653-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04683-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04684-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04690-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04793-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04231-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04333-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04334-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04335-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04336-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04379-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04380-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04381-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04447-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04475-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04476-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04549-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04553-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04608-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04614-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04620-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04630-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04637-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04653-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04683-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04684-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04690-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04793-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • (#6) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:19-cv-04320-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04323-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04329-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04332-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04333-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04334-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04335-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04336-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 10/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04320-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04323-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04329-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04332-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04333-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04334-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04335-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-04336-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/30/2019. (LBT) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson and Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4333-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Matthews on behalf of Plaintiff KAREN LOUISE SHIELDS. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by KAREN LOUISE SHIELDS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5693431) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matthews, David) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.