This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 08:28:30 (UTC).

Shields v. Capital One Auto Finance

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Shields filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capital One Auto Finance . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael R. Barrett, Douglas R. Cole and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

Presiding Judges

Michael R. Barrett

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paris Demetrious Shields

Cincinnati, OH 45239

Defendant

Capital One Auto Finance

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Envelope

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and authorizing commencement of this action without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/14/2022. (kh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Capital One Auto Finance, filed by Paris Demetrious Shields. (kh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Capital One Auto Finance and sent to the U.S> Marshals along with a copy of the order granting IFP, the complaint, and USM-285 Forms. (bjc) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/20/2022. (kkz)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Main Document 5 replaced to correct typo on 1/20/2022) (kkz). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/20/2022. (kkz)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Main Document 5 replaced to correct typo on 1/20/2022) (kkz). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Capital One Auto Finance and sent to the U.S> Marshals along with a copy of the order granting IFP, the complaint, and USM-285 Forms. (bjc) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Capital One Auto Finance, filed by Paris Demetrious Shields. (kh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and authorizing commencement of this action without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/14/2022. (kh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Paris Demetrious Shields. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (bjc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/14/2022) (bjc). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE is a litigant