This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 08:14:56 (UTC).

Sherum v. Bloodsaw et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Sherum filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bloodsaw. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Larry R. Hicks and Carla Baldwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00223

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Larry R. Hicks

Referral Judge

Carla Baldwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Warren Wayne Sherum

Defendants

Eric John Bloodsaw, Jr

Landstar Ranger, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Buchanan Greene

5555 Kietzke Lane, Suite 150

Reno, NV 89511

Robert D. Vannah

Attorney at Golightly & Vannah

5555 Kietzke Lane, Suite 150

Reno, NV 89511

John Greene

Attorney at Golightly & Vannah, PLLC

5555 Kietzke Lane, Suite 150

Reno, NV 89511

Defendant Attorneys

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Landstar Ranger, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company for Landstar Ranger, Inc. added. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Eric John Bloodsaw, Jr. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Defendants' ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Eric John Bloodsaw, Jr. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/2/2022.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/18/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/2/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER - Defendants are granted twenty (20) days from entry of this Order to establish the minimum amount in controversy for federal jurisdiction. Sherum is granted ten (10) days to file an opposition. No reply is required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Warren Wayne Sherum. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #6 Order, by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER - The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this case through diversity. jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#12

(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than July 25, 2022 as detailed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#14

(#14) Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc... (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER approving ECF No. #14 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/14/2022. Motions due by 12/14/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HKL) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HKL) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER approving ECF No. #14 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/14/2022. Motions due by 12/14/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc... (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than July 25, 2022 as detailed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - The Court finds that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this case through diversity. jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #6 Order, by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Warren Wayne Sherum. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - Defendants are granted twenty (20) days from entry of this Order to establish the minimum amount in controversy for federal jurisdiction. Sherum is granted ten (10) days to file an opposition. No reply is required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/18/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/2/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendants' ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Eric John Bloodsaw, Jr. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/2/2022.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Eric John Bloodsaw, Jr. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Landstar Ranger, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company for Landstar Ranger, Inc. added. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, County of Washoe, Case Number CV22-00676, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-6907205) by Eric John Bloodsaw, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDSTAR RANGER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karie N. Wilson