This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2022 at 15:16:53 (UTC).

SHERMAN v. AIRGAS USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 SHERMAN filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AIRGAS USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05478

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVE SHERMAN

Defendant

AIRGAS USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARRY A. WEISBERG

Attorney at WEISBERG CUMMINGS PC

2704 Commerce Dr Suite B

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL H. AIKEN

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Sts.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/7/2022. 1/7/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by STEVE SHERMAN. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 1/31/22. PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 1/18/22. DEFENDNATS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 1/31/22. DATE FOR ENTRY INTO TRIAL POOL IS 3/14/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/7/21. 12/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO EXEND DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS 11/30/21. DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IS 12/31/21. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS 12/16/21. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS DUE BY 12/31/21. DATE FOR TRIAL OR ENTRY INTO TRIAL POOL IS 2/14/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/14/21. 9/14/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DISCOVERY SHALL BE FILED BY 9/30/21. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 10/29/21. PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 10/15/21. DEFENDANTS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 10/29/21. THE TRIAL POOL DATE IS 12/13/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/11/21. 6/11/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/7/2022. 1/7/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by STEVE SHERMAN. (WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 1/31/22. PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 1/18/22. DEFENDNATS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 1/31/22. DATE FOR ENTRY INTO TRIAL POOL IS 3/14/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/7/21. 12/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Memoranda filed by STEVE SHERMAN.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO EXEND DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS 11/30/21. DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IS 12/31/21. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS 12/16/21. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS DUE BY 12/31/21. DATE FOR TRIAL OR ENTRY INTO TRIAL POOL IS 2/14/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/14/21. 9/14/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by AIRGAS USA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. DISCOVERY SHALL BE FILED BY 9/30/21. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 10/29/21. PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 10/15/21. DEFENDANTS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 10/29/21. THE TRIAL POOL DATE IS 12/13/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/11/21. 6/11/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by AIRGAS USA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE Settlement Conference held on 3/24/21. (amas, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY VIDEO ON 3/24/2021, AT 10:00 AM, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 2/19/21. 2/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Pretrial Conference held on 1/21/21 (amas, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED NOTICE (NEW DATE/TIME) of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESET FOR 1/21/2021 01:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THIS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINIARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/20/2021 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of AIRGAS USA, LLC (RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Airgas, Inc. by AIRGAS USA, LLC.(AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by AIRGAS USA, LLC.(AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. AIKEN on behalf of AIRGAS USA, LLC (AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to AIRGAS USA, LLC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/3/20 (amas, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by STEVE SHERMAN. (fb) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AIRGAS USA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14685004.), filed by STEVE SHERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(WEISBERG, LARRY) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRGAS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry A Weisberg