This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2020 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc v. Mid-Century Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mid-Century Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01735

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc

Defendant

Mid-Century Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John F Mayer

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Sean A Bukowski

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Ryan R Graff

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy K Luell

Attorney at Crivello Carlson SC

The Empire Building, 710 N Plankinton Ave - Ste 500

Milwaukee, WI 53203-2404

Donald H Carlson

Attorney at Crivello Carlson SC

The Empire Building, 710 N Plankinton Ave - Ste 500

Milwaukee, WI 53203-2404

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc re #18 MOTION to Bifurcate and stay MOTION to Stay . (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) BRIEF in Support filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company re #18 MOTION to Bifurcate and stay . (Luell, Stacy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Bifurcate and stay by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Luell, Stacy). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/20/2019 (amb).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/17/2019. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/24/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 3/2/2020; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 6/2/2020; Discovery due by 8/3/2020; Dispositive Motions or Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2020, response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil L.R. 56 apply to dispositive motions. Any party filing proposed findings of fact shall email Word version of proposed findings to PepperPO@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Luell, Stacy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luell, Stacy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R Graff on behalf of Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan R. Graff (Graff, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • (#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/3/2019. The court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report by the end of the day on December 17, 2019 updating the court as to the status of this case and the parties' anticipated next steps. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Witness List by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant has filed a motion to transfer this lawsuit to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, asserting that this would be more convenient for the parties, more convenient for the witnesses, and in the interests of justice. See dkt. #5 . All three assertions appear to be accurate, and plaintiff does not oppose the motion. See dkt. #7 . Therefore, it is ORDERED that defendant's motion to transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/26/2019. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff Sherman Creek Condominiums, Inc. re: #5 Motion to Transfer, filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Mayer, John) Modified on 11/22/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Affidavit of Stacy K. Luell filed by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company re: #5 Motion to Transfer. (Luell, Stacy) Modified on 11/1/2019: Exhibit A is attached to the motion. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 11/22/2019. Brief in Reply due 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Summons and Complaint) (Luell, Stacy) Modified on 11/1/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company, case number 19-cv-2210. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County, case number 19cv2210 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2568860) filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Order for Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Mid-Century Answer to Amended Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Mid-Century Disclosure Statement, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luell, Stacy) Modified on 10/31/2019: Notice of Removal has state court case number. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Stacy Kay Luell for Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Luell, Stacy) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Disregard. Refiled as #3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Modified on 10/31/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald H Carlson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy K Luell