This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2019 at 07:43:11 (UTC).

Sheridan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Sheridan filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry A. Bryant and Erin L. Wiedemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06117

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Barry A. Bryant

Erin L. Wiedemann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bonnie Faye Sheridan

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin Long

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 2333

Wylie, TX 75098

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 8, 2019. (hnc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Barry A. Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (mfr) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonnie Faye Sheridan. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Long, Martin) (Entered: 10/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Bonnie Faye Sheridan. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Long, Martin) (Entered: 10/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Andrew M. Saul for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Long, Martin) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 8, 2019. (hnc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 consent/reassignment)(hnc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bonnie Faye Sheridan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP Application)(Long, Martin). Added MOTION for Service on 10/8/2019 for docket maintenance (lw). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Bonnie Faye Sheridan Certificate of Interested Persons (Long, Martin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Bonnie Faye Sheridan.(Long, Martin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Bonnie Faye Sheridan. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less