This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2019 at 07:24:08 (UTC).

Sherco Construction Inc. v. North Country Custom Homes, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Sherco Construction Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against North Country Custom Homes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01592

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherco Construction Inc.

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Diane Daniels

Doug Westbrock

North Country Custom Homes, Inc.

Thomas Walczak

Linda Westbrock

Drafting & Design L.L.C.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Doug Westbrock

Linda Westbrock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C Alden Pearson

Attorney at Alden Pearson, P.A.

982 Inwood Ave N

Oakdale, MN 55128

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

J Vincent Stevens

Attorney at Miller & Stevens, P.A.

92 Lake Street South

Forest Lake, MN 55025

Mark K Thompson

Attorney at Mkt Law, PLC

4927 34Th Avenue South, 100 Nokomis Professional Building

Minneapolis, MN 55417

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Mark K Thompson

Attorney at Mkt Law, PLC

4927 34Th Avenue South, 100 Nokomis Professional Building

Minneapolis, MN 55417

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Consent Form

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Affidavit of Service

#12

11 #1

Affidavit of Service

#11

10 #1

Affidavit of Service

#10

9 #1

Affidavit of Service

#9

8 #1

Affidavit of Service

#8

7 #1

Affidavit of Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/19/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE by Doug Westbrock, Linda Westbrock re #13 First MOTION to Dismiss/General to Withdraw Motion (Thompson, Mark) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against Doug Westbrock, Linda Westbrock. filed by Drafting & Design L.L.C., Thomas Walczak, North Country Custom Homes, Inc., Diane Daniels. (Stevens, J) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by J Vincent Stevens on behalf of Diane Daniels, Drafting & Design L.L.C., North Country Custom Homes, Inc., Thomas Walczak. (Stevens, J) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Doug Westbrock, Linda Westbrock.(Thompson, Mark) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Doug Westbrock, Linda Westbrock. (Thompson, Mark) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherco Construction Inc.. North Country Custom Homes, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pearson, C) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherco Construction Inc.. Thomas Walczak served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pearson, C) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherco Construction Inc.. Drafting & Design L.L.C. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pearson, C) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherco Construction Inc.. Diane Daniels served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pearson, C) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (kt). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherco Construction Inc.. Doug Westbrock served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pearson, C) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherco Construction Inc.. Linda Westbrock served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Pearson, C) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Pearson, C) cc: Copyright Office with copy of complaint. Modified text on 7/11/2019 (JME). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Re-Issued as to Diane Daniels, Drafting & Design L.L.C., North Country Custom Homes, Inc., Thomas Walczak, Doug Westbrock, Linda Westbrock. (MMG) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Diane Daniels, Drafting & Design L.L.C., North Country Custom Homes, Inc., Thomas Walczak, Doug Westbrock, Linda Westbrock. (KDS) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Copyright & Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1592 SRN/ECW. (KDS) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Sherco Construction Inc.. (Pearson, C) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6943103) filed by Sherco Construction Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pearson, C) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carolyn A Pearson