This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2021 at 11:02:05 (UTC).

SHEPLER et al v. BIG SKY RESORT et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 SHEPLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG SKY RESORT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Shepler

Daniel Shepler

Defendants

CNL Lifestyle Properties, Inc.

John Doe 1 Through 5

Xyz Manufacturers 1 Through 5

Big Sky Resort

Boyne Resorts

Abc Corp. 1 Through 5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LYNN ANNE LISBONA

Attorney at DWYER, CONNELL & LISBONA, ESQS.

100 Passaic Avenue

Fairfield, NJ 07004-3573

Michael Haynes

Attorney at JOYCE & MacDONALD, PLLP

100 E. Broadway, First Floor

Butte, MT 59701

William P. Joyce

Attorney at JOYCE & MacDONALD, PLLP

100 E. Broadway, First Floor

Butte, MT 59701

Defendant Attorneys

EDWARD JOHN TURRO

Attorney at HUESTON MCNULTY, P.C.

26 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 207

Glorham Park, NJ 07932

SAMUEL J. MCNULTY

Attorney at HUESTON, MCNULTY, PC

256 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 207

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Ian McIntosh

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

20 #1

*Restricted*

#20

#19

16 #5

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

16 #4

Exhibit A-G

6 #2

Certification

6 #1

Brief

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Big Sky's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Big Sky Resort, Boyne Resorts. (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Daniel Shepler, Michelle Shepler (Haynes, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Big Sky Resort, Boyne Resorts (McIntosh, Ian) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: This case was transferred from the District of New Jersey on November 18, 2020. (Doc. 20.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all partiesappearing pro hac vice must follow the procedure set forth in Local Rule 83.1(d), by December 18, 2020, in order to properly appear before this Court. Local Rule 83.1(d)(2), requires a non-member attorney who does not reside in Montana to obtain the name, address, telephone number, and written consent of local counsel who is a member of the bar of this Court and whom the court and opposing counsel may readily communicate regarding the conduct of the case, upon whom documents will be served. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/18/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-06839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (ACC, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the conclusions of law of this Court. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/17/20. (jc, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BIG SKY RESORT, BOYNE RESORTS, #16 Cross MOTION to Change Venue filed by MICHELLE SHEPLER, DANIEL SHEPLER. Objections, if any, to R&R due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/2/20. (jc, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIG SKY RESORT, BOYNE RESORTS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #16 Cross MOTION to Change Venue (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #16 Cross MOTION to Change Venue. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Cross MOTION to Change Venue by DANIEL SHEPLER, MICHELLE SHEPLER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of filing, #2 Certification of Lynn Lisbona, Esq., #3 Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit A-G, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LISBONA, LYNN) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss by BIG SKY RESORT, BOYNE RESORTS. (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 and #5 Corporation Disclosure Statements, and #6 Motion to Dismiss submitted by Samuel J. McNulty on 8/25/20 all contain improper signatures. Only the filing user (Edward Turro) is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT ALL OF THE DOCUMENTS WITH PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES. Also, the #6 Motion to Dismiss is missing a Proposed Order as an attachment. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BIG SKY RESORT, BOYNE RESORTS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit)(TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOYNE RESORTS. (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIG SKY RESORT. (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD JOHN TURRO on behalf of BIG SKY RESORT, BOYNE RESORTS (TURRO, EDWARD) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIG SKY RESORT, BOYNE RESORTS, CNL LIFESTYLE PROPERTIES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10900232) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHELLE SHEPLER, DANIEL SHEPLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LISBONA, LYNN) [Transferred from njd on 11/18/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CNL LIFESTYLE PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel J. McNulty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian McIntosh