This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2020 at 09:44:26 (UTC).

Shepardson v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Shepardson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00503

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virginia Shepardson

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

CVS Pharmacy, LLC

dormakaba USA, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Defendants

dormakaba USA, Inc.

Automatic Door Dr. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William E. McCoy

Attorney at Heller, Heller & McCoy

736 Norwich-New London Turnpike

Uncasville, CT 06382

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Young B. Han

Attorney at Davids & Cohen, P.C.

40 Washington St., Suite 20

Wellesley, MA 02481

Paul Michienzie

Attorney at Michienzie & Sawin LLC

745 Boylston Street, Suite 501

Boston, MA 02116

3Rd Party Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Paul Michienzie

Attorney at Michienzie & Sawin LLC

745 Boylston Street, Suite 501

Boston, MA 02116

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#21

#20

#19

#17

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

#7

6 #1

STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES

#6

#5

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Fourth Party Complaint against Automatic Door Dr. Inc., filed by dormakaba USA, Inc..(Michienzie, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE by dormakaba USA, Inc. of Filing of Fourth Party Complaint (Michienzie, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to #17 Third Party Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by dormakaba USA, Inc..(Michienzie, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Corporate Disclosure Statement by dormakaba USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KABA U.S. Holding Ltd, Corporate Parent dormakaba Schweiz AG., Corporate Parent dormakaba International Holding AG for dormakaba USA, Inc.. (Michienzie, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michienzie on behalf of dormakaba USA, Inc. (Michienzie, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Third Party SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVS Pharmacy, LLC. dormakaba USA, Inc. served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Han, Young) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 12/15/2020; Initial Status Report due by 6/18/2020; Prefiling Conference Re: Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2020; Settlement Conference 1/2021; Trial Ready Date 5/3/2021; Trial Brief due by 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/18/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Virginia Shepardson. (McCoy, William) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *dormakaba USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Young B. Han* *Davids & Cohen, P.C.* *40 Washington St., Suite 20* *Wellesley, MA 02481*. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Han, Young) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFENDANT, CVS PHARMACY, INC.S CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Serving Court Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Han, Young) Modified docket text to reflect title of document on 5/4/2020 (Agati, Kathryn). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Young B. Han on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Han, Young) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #2 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2020, Discovery due by 10/15/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. of pending motions (Han, Young) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from New London Superior, case number KNL-CV20-6046004-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5803829, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Summons, Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Corporate summary, #3 Exhibit Corporate summary)(Han, Young) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DORMA USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Michienzie