This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2022 at 07:52:35 (UTC).

Shepard v. Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 Shepard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Philip Calabrese and David A. Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J. Philip Calabrese

David A. Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebecca M. Shepard

Akron, OH 44320

Defendant

Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rema A. Ina

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Sara E. DeCaro

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Initial disclosures to be exchanged by 5/9/2022. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 4/29/2022. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David A. Ruiz. Conferencing instructions to be provided before the conference. Fact Discovery due by 6/10/2022. Plaintiff's Expert reports due by 6/6/2022. Rebuttal expert reports due by 8/5/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2022. Parties are advised to carefully read this Order for additional information and requirements, and are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/24/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

12 #1

Brief in Support

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Receipt

11 #11

Main Document

13 #1

Corrected Main Document

13 #13

*Restricted*

5 #1

Rule 26 Report of Parties

5 #5

Main Document

1 #13

Summons

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Medical Records

1 #8

Life Expectancy

1 #6

Information Requested for Claim, Letters, and Certficate of Death

1 #4

Plan of Care with Letters and Emails

1 #2

Progress Notes

1 #1

Information Requested for Claim and Letter

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #13 Minutes of Case Management Conference, #14 Case Management Conference Plan/Order mailed to Rebecca M. Shepard, 973 Hartford Avenue, Akron, OH 44320 on 3/24/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Initial disclosures to be exchanged by 5/9/2022. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 4/29/2022. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David A. Ruiz. Conferencing instructions to be provided before the conference. Fact Discovery due by 6/10/2022. Plaintiff's Expert reports due by 6/6/2022. Rebuttal expert reports due by 8/5/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2022. Parties are advised to carefully read this Order for additional information and requirements, and are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/24/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted filed by Defendant Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Ina, Rema) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion to Amend the Plaintiff's Title filed by Plaintiff Rebecca M. Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(M,TL) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Minutes of proceedings before Judge David A. Ruiz. Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2022. The court established a discovery schedule and set dispositive motion deadlines as indicated in a separate case management order to follow. (Court Reporter: n/a) Time: 1 hour. (G,CA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2022: #1 Corrected Main Document) (G,CA). (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCopy of Case Management Conference Scheduling Order [non-document] and telephone conferencing instructions mailed to Rebecca M. Shepard, 973 Hartford Avenue, Akron, OH 44320 on 3/11/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference (CMC) Scheduling Order [non-document]: CMC set for 3/15/2022 is reset for 3/15/2022 at 2:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge David A. Ruiz*. Conferencing Instructions to be mailed to plaintiff and emailed to counsel. All other requirements and directives set forth in the CMC scheduling order (R. #5 ) remain in effect. *Note change in judge and to be held by telephone. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/11/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Status Report filed by Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. (Ina, Rema) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. (Ina, Rema) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Rema A. Ina and Sara E. DeCaro, filed by on behalf of Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. (Ina, Rema) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail, executed upon the Office of the U.S. Attorney General on 1/28/2022, filed on behalf of Rebecca M. Shepard. Related document(s) #2 . (K,L) Modified on 2/11/2022 (L,Br). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/15/2022 at 2:00 p.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs on 1/27/2001, filed on behalf of Rebecca M. Shepard. (Related document(s) #2 ) (P,G) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to U.S. Attorney Northern District of Ohio but contains no signature or date. (O,K) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0002 1957 5098. (M,TL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to U.S. Attorney Northern District of Ohio (Receipt #7015064000266649800) and to U.S. Attorney General (Receipt #7015064000266650004) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (K,L) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to plaintiff at the counter for service upon Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (K,L) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (K,L) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Louis Stokes Cleveland Department of Veteran Affairs. Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt # 54660008377. Filed by Rebecca M. Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Information Requested for Claim and Letter, #2 Progress Notes, #3 Medical Package Information, #4 Plan of Care with Letters and Emails, #5 Emails, #6 Information Requested for Claim, Letters, and Certificate of Death, #7 Emails, Letter, and Google Search, #8 Life Expectancy, #9 Victim Impact Statement, #10 Pictures, #11 Medical Records, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons) (K,L) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketJudge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (K,L) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara E. DeCaro

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rema A Ina