This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:51:26 (UTC).

SHEPARD et al v. GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY-

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 SHEPARD filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY-. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa Carroll Buchanan and Liam O'Grady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01104

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melanie Shepard

Ciara Vargas

Tisha Valdez

Gwyndaline Quarles

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Juliana Fondacaro

Mayra Verduzco

Andrea Kelly

Cole Millican

Mieshia Douglas

Charles Robbins

Ana Lynette Gregory Eldridge

Erik Lawrence

Rachel M. Frantz

Marie Mezile

Defendant

Gerber Products Company doing business as Nestle Nutrition, doing business as Nestle Infant Nutrition doing business as Nestle Nutrition North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Magagna

Attorney at LEVIN SEDRAN & BERMAN

510 Walnut Streetsuite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.

1600 Market Streetsuite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary S. Graifman

Attorney at Kantrowitz & Goldhamer

747 Chestnut Ridge Road

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Thomas Alan Brown, II

Attorney at MOREA SCHWARTZ BRADHAM FRIEDMAN & BROWN LLP

444 Madison Avenue4Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Joseph Lipari

Attorney at The Sultzer Law Group P.C.

270 Madison Avenuesuite 1800

New York, NY 10016

Jonathan David Lindenfeld

Attorney at FEGAN SCOTT LLC

140 Broadway46Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Douglas A. Abrahams

Attorney at KOHN, SWIFT, & GRAF, PC

1600 Market Streetsuite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7225

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey W. Castello, III

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Glenn T. Graham

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#62

(#62) ORDERED that the following civil actions are to be consolidated with the current case: 1:21-cv-489, 1:21-cv-789, 1:21-cv-1080, 1:21-cv-1171, 1:21-cv-372, 1:21-cv-478, 1:21-cv-902, 1:21-cv-1104; It is further ORDERED that:1. To the extent it is necessary, Gerber has waived service in all civil actions that are to be consolidated with the current case.2. Gerber's deadlines to move, answer, or respond to the civil actions (that are to be consolidated) are terminated as moot.3. The civil actions to be consolidated are to be considered properly consolidated for the purposes of filing any necessary motions. The deadline for opening leadership motions and supporting papers is changed to Friday, November 5, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/29/2021. (dest) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#61

#59

#58

#57

#56

#10

#7

#6

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Certification

5 #1

Certification

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:21cv269. (dest, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ORDERED that the following civil actions are to be consolidated with the current case: 1:21-cv-489, 1:21-cv-789, 1:21-cv-1080, 1:21-cv-1171, 1:21-cv-372, 1:21-cv-478, 1:21-cv-902, 1:21-cv-1104; It is further ORDERED that:1. To the extent it is necessary, Gerber has waived service in all civil actions that are to be consolidated with the current case.2. Gerber's deadlines to move, answer, or respond to the civil actions (that are to be consolidated) are terminated as moot.3. The civil actions to be consolidated are to be considered properly consolidated for the purposes of filing any necessary motions. The deadline for opening leadership motions and supporting papers is changed to Friday, November 5, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/29/2021. (dest) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-01977. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#60) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (smf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER that, Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. These consolidated actions shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia; that, no action shall be taken with respect to this Order for 14 days. See L. Civ. R. 72.1(c)(1)(C).. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 9/13/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) OPINION. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 9/13/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER that the matter 2:21-cv-13676-CCC-MF is consolidated with the Consolidated Action (2:21-cv-01977-CCC-MF). etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/10/2021. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, BLAKE G. ABBOTT, ESQ., ERIC M. POULIN, ESQ. and ROY T. WILEY, IV, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN DAVID LINDENFELD on behalf of Ana Lynette Gregory Eldridge (LINDENFELD, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III on behalf of GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY (CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 45 days to April 26, 2021. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/9/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY. (CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, Esq.. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/1/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey S. Goldenberg by GWYNDALINE QUARLES, MELANIE SHEPARD, TISHA VALDEZ, CIARA VARGAS. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID MAGAGNA on behalf of GWYNDALINE QUARLES, MELANIE SHEPARD, TISHA VALDEZ, CIARA VARGAS (MAGAGNA, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELANIE SHEPARD, GWYNDALINE QUARLES, TISHA VALDEZ, CIARA VARGAS. GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY d/b/a Nestl Nutrition, Nestl Infant Nutrition, or Nestl Nutrition North America ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12090547) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MELANIE SHEPARD, GWYNDALINE QUARLES, TISHA VALDEZ, CIARA VARGAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/1/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gerber Products Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Lipari

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas A. Abraham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Brown