This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 07:23:59 (UTC).

SHELTON v. HST LESSEE LAX LP et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2022 SHELTON filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against HST LESSEE LAX LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00452

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH J. SHELTON

Defendants

WESTIN OPERATOR LLC

SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION

HST LESSEE LAX LP as Lessee of the Westin Los Angeles Airport and doing business as WESTIN LOS ANGELES AIRPORT

STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles William Gilligan

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOSEPH J. SHELTON (Keenan, Daniel) Modified on 3/18/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

03/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. Attorney login credentials and signature on the pleading must match. (ztth) Modified on 3/18/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOSEPH J. SHELTON (Keenan, Daniel) Modified on 3/18/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to HST LESSEE LAX LP, SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION, STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE, LLC, WESTIN OPERATOR LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HST LESSEE LAX LP, SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION, STARWOOD HOTEL & RESORTS WORLDWIDE, LLC, WESTIN OPERATOR LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9055410) filed by Joseph J Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Gilligan, Charles) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less