This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 10:11:20 (UTC).

SHELTON v. TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 SHELTON filed an Other lawsuit against TATE KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00443

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAWN SHELTON

Defendant

TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL L. GREENWALD

Attorney at GREENWALD DAVIDSON, PLLC

5550 Glades Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33431

WESLEY S. WHITE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WESLEY S. WHITE

2300 E. 7Th St. Suite 101

Charlotte, NC 28204

Defendant Attorney

SEAN TIMOTHY PARTRICK

Attorney at YATES, MCLAMB & WEYHER, LLP

Pob 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/21/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.. (PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.. (PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SEAN TIMOTHY PARTRICK on behalf of Defendant TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. (PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 5/10/2019, filed by DAWN SHELTON. . (GREENWALD, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/13/2019 to edit text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeing before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL L. GREENWALD on behalf of Plaintiff DAWN SHELTON (GREENWALD, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2558511.), filed by DAWN SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WHITE, WESLEY) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/21/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.. (PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.. (PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. Answer due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 5/30/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SEAN TIMOTHY PARTRICK on behalf of Defendant TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. (PARTRICK, SEAN) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Answer updated for TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. to 5/31/2019. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 5/10/2019, filed by DAWN SHELTON. . (GREENWALD, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/13/2019 to edit text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeing before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL L. GREENWALD on behalf of Plaintiff DAWN SHELTON (GREENWALD, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against TATE & KIRLIN ASSOCIATES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2558511.), filed by DAWN SHELTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WHITE, WESLEY) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.