This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 09:00:03 (UTC).

Shelly Ashton et al v. The J.M. Smucker Co. et al ***Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-2984***

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Shelly Ashton filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The J M Smucker Co Do Not File in this Case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-2984. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frederick Tan

Shelly Ashton

Jay Schoener

Ramon Ibarra

Defendants

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

The Folger Coffee Co.

The J.M. Smucker Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David N. Lake

Attorney at Law Offices of David N Lake APC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 650

Encino, CA 91436

Patricia N. Syverson

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman and Balint PC

600 West Broadway Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Carrie Ann Laliberte

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman and Balint PC

2325 East Camelback Road Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Elaine Ann Ryan

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman and Balint PC

2325 East Camelback Road Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Aubry Wand

Attorney at The Wand Law Firm

400 Corporate Pointe Suite 300

Culver City, CA 90230

Lubna M. Faruqi

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi, LLP

685 Third Avenue, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Benjamin Heikali

10866 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Todd D Carpenter

Attorney at Carlson Lynch LLP

1350 Columbia Street Suite 603

San Diego, CA 92101

Scott Gregory Braden

Attorney at Carlson Lynch LLP

1350 Columbia Street Suite 603

San Diego, CA 92101

Joshua Nassir

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald Y Rothstein

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Amanda Jereige

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Megan Lee Whipp

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster

707 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sean H Suber

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

72 #1

*Restricted*

#72

(#72) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-00992. (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#71

(#71) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2984, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Missouri and assigned to Honorable Beth Phillips. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#70

(#70) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Jereige counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Adding Amanda Jereige as counsel of record for The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company. (Attorney Amanda Jereige added to party The Folger Coffee Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Jereige added to party The J.M. Smucker Co.(pty:dft))(Jereige, Amanda) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#69

(#69) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan Lee Whipp counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Megan L. Whipp is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company. (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#68

(#68) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Discovery cut-off 11/22/2021. Motions cut-off 2/14/2022. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/27/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (npo) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#67

(#67) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #64 Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

64 #1

Proposed Order

#64

(#64) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine Ann Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30875581) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, upon Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent: CT Corporation System - Shelbi Sullenberger in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#2

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-00992. (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2984, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Missouri and assigned to Honorable Beth Phillips. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Jereige counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Adding Amanda Jereige as counsel of record for The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company. (Attorney Amanda Jereige added to party The Folger Coffee Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Jereige added to party The J.M. Smucker Co.(pty:dft))(Jereige, Amanda) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan Lee Whipp counsel for Defendants The Folger Coffee Co., The J.M. Smucker Co.. Megan L. Whipp is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants The J.M. Smucker Company and The Folger Coffee Company. (Whipp, Megan) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Discovery cut-off 11/22/2021. Motions cut-off 2/14/2022. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/27/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (npo) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #64 Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #65 Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Frederick Tan, designating David N. Lake as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie Ann Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30875668) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine Ann Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party Frederick Tan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30875581) filed by Plaintiff Frederick Tan. Application set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lake, David) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • Docket(#63) The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 05/19/2020. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, upon Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent: CT Corporation System - Shelbi Sullenberger in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The J.M. Smucker Co. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener, (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26382296 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shelly Ashton, Jay Schoener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Shelly Ashton(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Jay Schoener(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) [Transferred from cacd on 4/5/2021.] (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Folger Coffee Company is a litigant

Latest cases where J.M. Smucker Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Jereige

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean H. Suber Esq.