This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2021 at 09:29:53 (UTC).

Shelli French v. Neutrogena Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Shelli French filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Neutrogena Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05048

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shelli French

Nicole Sander

Defendants

Neutrogena Corporation

Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor and Fisher PA

1990 North California Boulevard Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelli French, (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31500393 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher added to party Shelli French(pty:pla))(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-05048 SB(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 filed by Plaintiffs Shelli French, Nicole Sander. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Shelli French, Nicole Sander(Attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher added to party Nicole Sander(pty:pla))(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AND AMEND COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 15(a)(2) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation #9 be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), Plaintiff shall amend her Complaint to substitute Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. ("JJCI") as the proper party in interest in this action and to add an additional putative class representative, on or before 7/30/2021. JJCI shall answer or otherwise respond within 45 days of the filing of the Amended Complaint. (gk) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE STANLEY BLUMENFELD, JR. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Counsel for the plaintiff must immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Neutrogena Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelli French, (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31500393 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher added to party Shelli French(pty:pla))(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Neutrogena Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Timothy Fisher