This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 10:21:45 (UTC).

Shelli French v. Neutrogena Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Shelli French filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Neutrogena Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62151

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shelli French

Nicole Sander

Defendant

Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence Timothy Fisher

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Neubauer

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

18 #1

*Restricted*

18 #18

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#17

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#14

#11

9 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. (eca) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#20) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:2105048 . Assigned FLSD Case Number 0:21-cv-62151 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:21-md-3015-AHS. Clerks Note: JPML notified (pes) Modified text on 10/19/2021 (pes). (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#19) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (pes) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-05048. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes). (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3015, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Anuraag Singhal. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND #15 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. Accordingly, JJCI shall answer, move or otherwise reply to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before October 29, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 29, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Mark A. Neubauer added to party Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.(pty:dft))(Neubauer, Mark) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-05048 SB(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AND AMEND COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 15(a)(2) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation #9 be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), Plaintiff shall amend her Complaint to substitute Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. ("JJCI") as the proper party in interest in this action and to add an additional putative class representative, on or before 7/30/2021. JJCI shall answer or otherwise respond within 45 days of the filing of the Amended Complaint. (gk) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE STANLEY BLUMENFELD, JR. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Counsel for the plaintiff must immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Neutrogena Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shelli French, (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31500393 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Shelli French. (Attorney Lawrence Timothy Fisher added to party Shelli French(pty:pla))(Fisher, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less