This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 08:16:34 (UTC).

Shelley v. Pyle et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Shelley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pyle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth K. Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth K. Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Shelley

Kennett Square, PA 19348

Defendants

Laura Pyle

McCaskey & Pyle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Thomas G. Bell, Jr.

Attorney at Timberlake Smith Thomas & Moses, PC

25 N. Central Avenue

Staunton, VA 24401

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (kld)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint #1 by McCaskey & Pyle, Laura Pyle.(Bell, Thomas)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Laura Pyle and McCaskey & Pyle on 11/14/19; answers due 12/5/2019.(kld)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to McCaskey & Pyle, Laura Pyle.(kld)

1 #3

cover letter

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against McCaskey & Pyle, Laura Pyle (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt 500003119.), filed by Timothy Shelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope, #3 cover letter) (kld).

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint #1 by McCaskey & Pyle, Laura Pyle.(Bell, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Laura Pyle and McCaskey & Pyle on 11/14/19; answers due 12/5/2019.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to McCaskey & Pyle, Laura Pyle.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against McCaskey & Pyle, Laura Pyle (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt 500003119.), filed by Timothy Shelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope, #3 cover letter) (kld).

    Read MoreRead Less