This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:58:58 (UTC).

Shelby v. C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Shelby filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against C J Clark Retail, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03292

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Shelby

Defendants

Ben Bunnell, individually

C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., individually and d/b/a Clarks

C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc.

Ben Bunnell

C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. individually doing business as Clarks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silvia Cristina Stanciu

Attorney at Phillips & Associates

45 Broadway, Suite 620

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ben Bunnell waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ben Bunnell, C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc...(pne) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., individually and d/b/a Clarks, Ben Bunnell, individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ben Bunnell, individually, C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., individually and d/b/a Clarks. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19604815)Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ben Bunnell waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Silvia Cristina Stanciu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., Ben Bunnell. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was contained a typographical error; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ben Bunnell, C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc...(pne) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., individually and d/b/a Clarks, Ben Bunnell, individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ben Bunnell, individually, C. & J. Clark Retail, Inc., individually and d/b/a Clarks. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19604815)Document filed by Joe Shelby..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & J Clark Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVIA CRISTINA STANCIU