This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 11:11:52 (UTC).

Shehadeh et al v. Bergeron et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Shehadeh filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bergeron. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abdallah Shehadeh

Suha Shehadeh

Defendants

Yokogawa Corporation of America

Sompo America Insurance Company

Noah Bergeron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Day

Attorney at Fisher Injury Lawyers

6715 Perkins Rd

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Bryan D. Fisher

Attorney at Fisher Injury Lawyers

6715 Perkins Road

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Michelle Roe

Attorney at Taylor Wellons Politz Duhe

8550 United Plaza Boulevard, Suite 101

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Charles J. Duhe, Jr.

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe- B.R.

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 101

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Exhibit Dr. Isaza - Redacted Medical Record Excerpts

5 #1

Exhibit Dr. Ferachi - Redacted Medical Record Excerpts

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Ferachi - Redacted Medical Record Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Dr. Isaza - Redacted Medical Record Excerpts)(Roe, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

3 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 7

3 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 6

3 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5

3 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4

3 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

3 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

3 #1

Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Remand

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Fisher, Bryan) Attachment 3 and 5 replaced on 5/16/2019 to correct page orientation (KMW). (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/22/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Medical Excerpts

1 #2

Exhibit Certified State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Ferachi - Redacted Medical Record Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Dr. Isaza - Redacted Medical Record Excerpts)(Roe, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice to Counsel: In light of the #3 Motion to Remand, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELED. Not status report is due. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Fisher, Bryan) Attachment 3 and 5 replaced on 5/16/2019 to correct page orientation (KMW). (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/22/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 668472. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1929744), filed by Sompo America Insurance Company, Noah Bergeron, Yokogawa Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certified State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Medical Excerpts)(Roe, Rachel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/22/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.