This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 11:23:53 (UTC).

Sheffler v. Americold Realty Trust

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Sheffler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Americold Realty Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clarence Cooper and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01075

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Clarence Cooper

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean Sheffler

Defendant

Americold Realty Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A. -T.FL

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Ryan D. Maxey

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A. -T.FL

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Gregory John Bosseler

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PLLC - Atl

Suite 4200, 191 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean Sheffler. Americold Realty Trust waiver mailed on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Yanchunis, John) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #9 and #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(usw) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of John Yanchunis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872770). Attorney John A. Yanchunis added appearing on behalf of Sean Sheffler (cdg) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Maxey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872751). Attorney Ryan D. Maxey added appearing on behalf of Sean Sheffler (cdg) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION for Admission of John Yanchunis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872770).by Sean Sheffler. (Bosseler, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Maxey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872751).by Sean Sheffler. (Bosseler, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Maxey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10855243). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's bar number. (cdg) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of John Yanchunis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10855155). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's bar number. (cdg) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Maxey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10855243).by Sean Sheffler. (Bosseler, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of John Yanchunis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10855155).by Sean Sheffler. (Bosseler, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to John A. Yanchunis. Clerk to follow-up by 4/5/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Ryan D. Maxey. Clerk to follow-up by 4/5/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Sean Sheffler (Bosseler, Gregory) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from the above-styled action. The Clerk is directed to reassign this action to another judge in accordance with the Internal Operating Procedures of this Court. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-1075-TCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/19/2021. (jta) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/2021. (eop) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sean Sheffler. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10830078) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 3/17/2021 (eop). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D. Maxey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory John Bosseler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Yanchunis