Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 06:50:40 (UTC).

SHEERON et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 SHEERON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are EDUARDO C. ROBRENO and THOMAS J. RUETER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04669

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

Referral Judge

THOMAS J. RUETER

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

PHILADELPHIA SHIP MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

VIKING PUMP, INC.

SPIRAX SARCO, INC.

BRISTOL PENN JERSEY, INC.

THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY

GRINNELL LLC

FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

DAMIC CORPORATION

J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY

FLOWSERVE US, INC. SOLEY AS SUCESSOR TO ALIAS : VOGT VALVE COMPANY

PENN JERSEY AUTO, INC.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION

VELAN VALVE COPRORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.

PHILADELPHIA SHIP REPAIR, LLC

COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

TIFFANY F. TURNER

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

1650 Arch Street, Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PATRICK T. FINNEGAN

Attorney at MCGIVNEY & KLUGER, P.C.

1650 Arch St Suite 1800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

AARON ARTHUR

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SUSAN M. VALINIS

Attorney at REILLY JANICZEK & MCDEVITT P.C.

Widener Building, Suite 410, One South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

DAMIAN JACKSON

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200, P.O.Box 3001

Blue Bell, PA 19422

JEFFREY M. PYPCZNSKI

Attorney at PORZIO BROMBERG & NEWMAN PC

100 Southgate Pkwy, P.O. Box 1997

Morristown, NJ 07962

INGRID H. GRAFF

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN, P.C.

2000 Market Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4797

TIFFANY GIANGIULIO

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

JOHN A. TURLIK

Attorney at SEGAL MCCAMBRIDGE SINGER & MAHONEY

1818 Market St Ste 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

FRANCIS A. EIDEN

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

200 Lake Drive East, Suite 205

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL

Attorney at GOLDFEIN & JOSEPH PC

1880 John F Kennedy Blvd, 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TERENCE M. PITT

Attorney at GERMAN, GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

1500 Market St Suite 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19102

BASIL A. DISIPIO

Attorney at LAVIN, CEDRONE, GRAVER, BOYD & DISIPIO

190 N. Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL, LLC

One Liberty Place 38Th Floor, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

KEVIN O'BRIEN

Attorney at MARKS, O'NEILL, O'BRIEN, DOHERTY & KELLY P.C.

1617 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1010

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSEPH I FONTAK

Attorney at LEADER & BERKON LLP

1515 Market St Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

THERESA M. MULLANEY

Attorney at KENT & MCBRIDE PC

1617 Jfk Blvd, Ste 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GREGORY M. STOKES

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL LLC

Two Liberty Pl 28Th Fl, 50 South 16Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

STEWART R. SINGER

157B Bridgeton Pike, Suite 275, 1601 Market St Suite 2500

Mullica Hill, NJ 08062

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#170

(#170) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. HEYDEN, JR on behalf of VELAN VALVE COPRORATION with Certificate of Service(HEYDEN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#169

(#169) Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP, INC. Certificate of Service.(BLOCK, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/6/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#168

(#168) ORDERED THAT: THE FOLLOWING UNOPPOSED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE GRANTED:1 A. ECF NO. 101 MOTION FILED BY: COOPER INDUSTRIES B. ECF NO. 109 MOTION FILED BY: CROSBY VALVE, LLC C. ECF NO. 123 MOTION FILED BY: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS D. ECF NO. 124 MOTION FILED BY: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED BY ATWOOD & MORRILL CO. (ECF NO. 167) IS GRANTED AND ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 111) IS WITHDRAWN AND SHALL BE TERMINATED ON THE DOCKET; IN LIGHT OF THE PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY BW/IP, INC. (ECF NO. 165), BW/IPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 122) IS WITHDRAWN AND SHALL BE TERMINATED ON THE DOCKET. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/2021.4/30/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#167

(#167) MOTION to Withdraw #111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY..(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#166

(#166) Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA) Modified on 3/31/2021 (md, ). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#165

(#165) Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment by BW/IP, INC.. (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#114

(#164) Praecipe to Withdraw #114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SPIRAX SARCO, INC. Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY) Modified on 3/25/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

111 #1

Exhibit A-H

#111

(#167) MOTION to Withdraw #111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY..(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Reply to Cross-Claims , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA M. MULLANEY on behalf of MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY (MULLANEY, THERESA) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP, INC.(TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 10/10/2019 (lisad, ). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #3

DESIGNATION FORM

1 #2

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #1

TRACK FORM

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 1909018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 204937) (Attachments: #1 TRACK FORM, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

366 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C. HEYDEN, JR on behalf of VELAN VALVE COPRORATION with Certificate of Service(HEYDEN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VIKING PUMP, INC. Certificate of Service.(BLOCK, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/6/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) ORDERED THAT: THE FOLLOWING UNOPPOSED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE GRANTED:1 A. ECF NO. 101 MOTION FILED BY: COOPER INDUSTRIES B. ECF NO. 109 MOTION FILED BY: CROSBY VALVE, LLC C. ECF NO. 123 MOTION FILED BY: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS D. ECF NO. 124 MOTION FILED BY: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED BY ATWOOD & MORRILL CO. (ECF NO. 167) IS GRANTED AND ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 111) IS WITHDRAWN AND SHALL BE TERMINATED ON THE DOCKET; IN LIGHT OF THE PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY BW/IP, INC. (ECF NO. 165), BW/IPS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 122) IS WITHDRAWN AND SHALL BE TERMINATED ON THE DOCKET. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 4/29/2021.4/30/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) MOTION to Withdraw #111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ATWOOD & MORRILL COMPANY..(RAU, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA) Modified on 3/31/2021 (md, ). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment by BW/IP, INC.. (TURLIK, JOHN) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) Praecipe to Withdraw #114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SPIRAX SARCO, INC. Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY) Modified on 3/25/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) Praecipe to Withdraw #115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY) Modified on 3/25/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SPIRAX SARCO, INC.,(hereinafter, Defendant or SPIRAX SARCO) BY AND THROUGH THEIR COUNSEL AND COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AGREE TO CONDUCT EXPERT DEPOSITIONS, IF APPLICABLE, AFTER THE RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/24/2021. 2/24/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS,INC., ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS,INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR TO TAPPAN AND COPES-VULCAN, (hereinafter,Defendant or ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.) BY AND THROUGH THEIR COUNSEL AND COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AGREE TO CONDUCT EXPERT DEPOSITIONS, IF APPLICABLE, AFTER THE RESOLUTIO NOF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 2/24/2021. 2/24/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of CROSBY VALVE, LLC with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FLOWSERVE CORPORATION with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FLOWSERVE US, INC..(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(PITT, TERENCE) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims and Reply to Cross-Claims , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA M. MULLANEY on behalf of MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY (MULLANEY, THERESA) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP, INC.(TURLIK, JOHN) Modified on 10/10/2019 (lisad, ). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 1909018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 204937) (Attachments: #1 TRACK FORM, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 DESIGNATION FORM)(sg, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLOWSERVE US, INC. SOLEY AS SUCESSOR TO ALIAS : VOGT VALVE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where J.H FRANCE REFRACTORIES COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SPIRAX SARCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant