This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 06:16:43 (UTC).

Shedal v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Shedal filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02788

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Shedal

Defendants

Atrium Medical Corporation

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales LLC

Getinge AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles H. Johnson

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles H Johnson, PA

2599 Mississippi St

New Brighton, MN 55112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Atrium Medical Corporation. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18) transferring case to the District of New Hampshire per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kt) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

8 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number: 0:22-cv-01440. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18) transferring case to the District of New Hampshire per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kt) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2753 re: #1 Complaint. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Atrium Medical Corporation. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-1440 (WMW/JFD).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Atrium Medical Corporation (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9541319) filed by Brandon Shedal. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maquet Cardiovascular US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles H. Johnson