Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:19:39 (UTC).

Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-OP-45226

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mylan Institutional Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Michael Babich

Steven Simon

Cardinal Health 200, LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Does 1 through 1000

Allergan U.S.A., Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Cardinal Health 132, LLC

Mylan N.V.

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Todd A. Nelson

Attorney at Gable Gotwals

1100 Oneok Plaza, 100 West Fifth Street

Tulsa, OK 74103-3318

Sandra J. Wunderlich

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - St. Louis

100 South Fourth Street

St. Louis, MO 63102

Brian C. Fries

Attorney at Lathrop & Gage - Kansas City

2345 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Kara T. Stubbs

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City

2400 Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108

Stephen G. Mirakian

Attorney at Wyrsch Hobbs Mirakian, PC

1200 Main Street, Suite 2110

Kansas City, MO 64105

James R. Wyrsch

Attorney at Wyrsch Hobbs Mirakian

1200 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105

Marilyn B. Keller

Attorney at Wyrsch Hobbs Mirakian, PC

1200 Main Street, Suite 2110

Kansas City, MO 64105

Sheena A. Foye

Attorney at Wyrsch Hobbs Mirakian, PC

1200 Main Street, Suite 2110

Kansas City, MO 64105

Brian M. Nye

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale, LLP - KC

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2617

Other Attorneys

Sean M. Sturdivan

Attorney at Sanders Warren Russell & Scheer, LLP - OP

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Suite 1250

Overland Park, KS 66210

Gary D. White, Jr.

Attorney at Palmer Law Group, LLC

2348 Sw Topeka Blvd.

Topeka, KS 66611

Brendan L. McPherson

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Tyler Waugh

Attorney at Sanders Warren Russell & Scheer, LLP - OP

9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Suite 1250

Overland Park, KS 66210

Jason L. Bush

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Dustin L. Van Dyk

Attorney at Palmer Law Group, LLC

2348 Sw Topeka Blvd.

Topeka, KS 66611

Kurt M. Mullen

Attorney at Nixon Peabody - Boston

53 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) Attorney Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen filed by on behalf of John Kapoor. (Mullen, Kurt) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

43 #1

*Restricted*

#43

(#43) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 5:20-cv-04022. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#42

(#42) TRANSFER ORDER by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the listed cases to the Northern District of Ohio. (jal) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

28 #8

Exhibit Ex. I

28 #6

Exhibit Ex. G

28 #5

Exhibit Ex. F

#28

(#41) ORDER - The Court grants the motion for a stay #24 , and all proceedings in this action are stayed pending the JPML's decision. Plaintiff's motion for expedited ruling #16 is denied as moot, and the motion for remand #16 remains pending. Plaintiff's request that the Court take judicial notice of various rulings in other courts #28 is granted as unopposed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/29/2020. (ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#24

(#41) ORDER - The Court grants the motion for a stay #24 , and all proceedings in this action are stayed pending the JPML's decision. Plaintiff's motion for expedited ruling #16 is denied as moot, and the motion for remand #16 remains pending. Plaintiff's request that the Court take judicial notice of various rulings in other courts #28 is granted as unopposed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/29/2020. (ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/29/2020)

7 #1

Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson identifying None as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas, case number 20-cv-000216 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5130581.), filed by Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Attorney Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen filed by on behalf of John Kapoor. (Mullen, Kurt) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 5:20-cv-04022. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated.(jal) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) TRANSFER ORDER by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the listed cases to the Northern District of Ohio. (jal) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER - The Court grants the motion for a stay #24 , and all proceedings in this action are stayed pending the JPML's decision. Plaintiff's motion for expedited ruling #16 is denied as moot, and the motion for remand #16 remains pending. Plaintiff's request that the Court take judicial notice of various rulings in other courts #28 is granted as unopposed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/29/2020. (ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 5/1/20 & 5/26/20. (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Endo Pharmaceuticals,Inc., served on 4/27/20. (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Endo Health Soultions,Inc., Served on 4/27/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., served on 5/1/20 & 5/26/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Complaint upon Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 4/9/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REVISED LETTER to attorneys from state court case regarding admission requirements for the District of Kansas. (Note: This is a revised version of docket entry # 8 which was missing the full heading.) Letter mailed via US Mail to attorneys Brian T. Kelly and Mark T. Knights; via NEF to all other attorneys. (kkw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter sent to the attorneys that requested pro hac vice status. (kkw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson identifying None as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas, case number 20-cv-000216 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5130581.), filed by Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mylan Institutional Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant