This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 07:47:13 (UTC).

Shaw v. Stachey

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Shaw filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stachey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan O. Hickey and Barry A. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06121

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

Referral Judge

Barry A. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Shaw

Atlanta, GA 30341

Defendants

Jason Stachey

Chief of Police Jason Stachey

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address for Eric Shaw. Documents that have previously been returned are being resent including #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Complaint and NEF of #5 Summons Issued. Plaintiff called Clerk's Office this date, he was not aware of this case number to include it on original change of address. (hnc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Not Deliverable as addressed. Mail originally sent to Eric Shaw at 3631 Chamblee Tucker Road, Suite C, General Delivery, Atlanta GA 30321 including #1 Complaint filed by Eric Shaw, NEF of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Motion for Service filed by Eric Shaw, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, NEF of Motions Referred, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service, and NEF of #5 Summons Issued. No new address available. (mjm) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Jason Stachey. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 17, 2019. (hnc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Eric Shaw. (lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jason Stachey, filed by Eric Shaw.(lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Address for Eric Shaw. Documents that have previously been returned are being resent including #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Complaint and NEF of #5 Summons Issued. Plaintiff called Clerk's Office this date, he was not aware of this case number to include it on original change of address. (hnc) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#7) TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant - Full Pretial/Dispositive Motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 12, 2019. (rwg) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Not Deliverable as addressed. Mail originally sent to Eric Shaw at 3631 Chamblee Tucker Road, Suite C, General Delivery, Atlanta GA 30321 including #1 Complaint filed by Eric Shaw, NEF of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Motion for Service filed by Eric Shaw, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, NEF of Motions Referred, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service, and NEF of #5 Summons Issued. No new address available. (mjm) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jason Stachey and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service, #1 Complaint. (hnc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/18/2019) (hnc). (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Jason Stachey. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 17, 2019. (hnc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Eric Shaw. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Eric Shaw. (lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jason Stachey, filed by Eric Shaw.(lw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.