This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 18:58:26 (UTC).

Shaw v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Shaw filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Monte C. Richardson and Harvey E. Schlesinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01442

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

Presiding Judge

Harvey E. Schlesinger

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carmus Renseler Shaw

Okeechobee, FL 34972

Respondents

Florida Attorney General

Secretary, Department of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Petitioner to pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency by 1/23/2020; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/23/2019. (CAW) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (MGG) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Carmus Renseler Shaw.(PAM) No fee payment or IFP received. Two service copies received. No postmark reflected on envelope (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketFEES paid by Carmus Renseler Shaw (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number JAX032455) (AEJ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing Petitioner to pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency by 1/23/2020; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/23/2019. (CAW) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (MGG) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Carmus Renseler Shaw.(PAM) No fee payment or IFP received. Two service copies received. No postmark reflected on envelope (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.