This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2021 at 09:07:42 (UTC).

Shaw v. OTB Acquisition, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Shaw filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against OTB Acquisition, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martinez and Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02104

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Shaw

Defendant

OTB Acquisition, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Don J. Foty

Attorney at Hodges & Foty LLP

4409 Montrose Boulevard, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Lori Marie Griffin

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

34555 Chagrin Boulevard, The Heritage Building

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Defendant Attorney

Kendra Dawn Presswood

Attorney at Shankman Leone, P.A.

707 N. Franklin Street, Ste. 500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Brandon Shaw. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel Lori M. Griffin by Lori Marie Griffin on behalf of Brandon ShawAttorney Lori Marie Griffin added to party Brandon Shaw(pty:pla) (Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brandon Shaw All parties do not consent.. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Kendra Dawn Presswood added to party OTB Acquisition, LLC(pty:dft) by OTB Acquisition, LLC.(Presswood, Kendra) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/13/2021. Consent Form due by 9/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/29/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/6/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (alave, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Shaw. OTB Acquisition, LLC served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #3

Main Document

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Brandon Shaw. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel Lori M. Griffin by Lori Marie Griffin on behalf of Brandon ShawAttorney Lori Marie Griffin added to party Brandon Shaw(pty:pla) (Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 24/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/24/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02104-WJM. (Text Only Entry). (alave, ) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brandon Shaw All parties do not consent.. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER: As of August 16, 2021, the public health risks caused by the coronavirus, and in particular, the Delta variant of the coronavirus, continue to be present. In order to support public health efforts to cabin the spread of the coronavirus, to protect the health of the Parties and counsel by minimizing their need to travel, and to protect the health of the general public, the following measures are adopted in an abundance of caution. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) All proceedings, notwithstanding any evidentiary proceedings, including but not limited to trials, which are scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022, shall be held via telephone conference, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Participants may access this court's conference line by using the following dial-in information: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code 5738976. This Amended Standing Order does not apply to any criminal matters; evidentiary civil matters; or other matters specifically set after the effective date to be in-person, scheduled through January 1, 2022; (2) All jury trials scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022 shall proceed as scheduled, pursuant to the District of Colorado's Jury Trial Protocols and its effective General Order(s), available at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/COVID-19Guidance.aspx; and (3) Parties and/or counsel are advised to check information on the website of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado (http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/) and specifically, for Magistrate Judge Wang, for continuing information. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/15/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Kendra Dawn Presswood added to party OTB Acquisition, LLC(pty:dft) by OTB Acquisition, LLC.(Presswood, Kendra) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/13/2021. Consent Form due by 9/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/29/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/6/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (alave, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Shaw. OTB Acquisition, LLC served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Collective and Class Action) against OTB Acquisition, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-7998949)Attorney Don J. Foty added to party Brandon Shaw(pty:pla), filed by Brandon Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OTB Acquisition LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kendra D Presswood