Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:45:38 (UTC).

Shaw v. City of Milwaukee et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Shaw filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against City of Milwaukee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy Joseph and William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01059

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nancy Joseph

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William R Shaw

Defendants

Michael Antoniak

Daniel Teska

Terrence Gordon

Unknown Radiologist or X Ray Technician

Phil Henschel

Unknown Milwaukee Police Department Employees and Officers

Kristopher Maduscha

Unknown Employer of Physical Assistant Daniel Teska

Chief Edward Flynn

Thomas J Slowinski

City of Milwaukee

Wheaton Franciscan Healthcare

Timothy A Hauf

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION to Clarify and or Supplement the requested relief by William R Shaw. (jcl)

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William R Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4), Shaw will not be required to pay an initial partial filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Shaw wishes to voluntarily dismiss this action to avoid the possibility of incurring a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), Shaw shall so notify the court on or before August 20, 2019. (cc: all counsel, Sheriff)(asc)

#4

(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by William R Shaw. (ds) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by William R Shaw. (ds) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Clarify and or Supplement the requested relief by William R Shaw. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William R Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(cms) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Case reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (Mailed NEF to plaintiff via USPS) (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William R Shaw. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4), Shaw will not be required to pay an initial partial filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Shaw wishes to voluntarily dismiss this action to avoid the possibility of incurring a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), Shaw shall so notify the court on or before August 20, 2019. (cc: all counsel, Sheriff)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William R Shaw. (ds) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by William R Shaw. (ds) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by William R Shaw. (ds) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less