This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 10:41:38 (UTC).

Shaw et al v. National Liability & Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Shaw filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against National Liability Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00470

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kivonda Shaw

Leeroy Shaw

Defendants

National Liability & Fire Insurance Company

Tri-State Rock & Rails, LLC

John Doe

John Collins

National Liability and Fire Insurance Company

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward J. Womac, Jr.

Attorney at Edward J. Womac, Jr., & Associates, LLC

3501 Canal St., Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70119

Andrew James Murphy

Attorney at Edward J. Womac, Jr., & Associates, LLC

3501 Canal St., Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Raven Fielding

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Olivia C Mallary

Attorney at Duplass Zwain Bourgeois Pfister Weinstock & Bogart

3838 N Causeway Blvd, Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

C. Michael Pfister

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

8 #2

Proposed Pleading

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

7 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Proposed Pleading Verification

1 #3

Proposed Pleading Certification of Service

1 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to John Collins. (pp) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, Tri-State Rock & Rails, LLC, John Collins filed by Leeroy Shaw, Kivonda Shaw.(pp) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Original Petition For Damages. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their First Supplemental and Amending Petition and amend paragraphs in the Original Petition for Damages. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/22/2021. (pp) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Original Petition For Damages**All CM/ECF documents created via word-processing software should be saved as PDF files, not printed to hard copy and scanned. Within 3 working days, filing counsel is to provide the Court with a corrected version of their filing. The corrected version should be emailed to efile-morgan@laed.uscourts.gov. Within the email, filing counsel should include the case caption and document number the corrected version is in relation to. Please do not file the corrected version onto the record. For further information regarding which documents should or should not be scanned and filed onto the record, please visit http://www.laed.uscourts.gov/news/all-cmecf-documents-should-be-savedpdf- files-and-not-printed-hard-copy-and-scanned.** (pp) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Original Petition For Damages by Kivonda Shaw, Leeroy Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Andrew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/22/2021) (pp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2021: #2 Proposed Pleading) (pp). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. 4 day Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(bwn) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Tri-State Rock & Rails, LLC (Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, Tri-State Rock & Rails, LLC.(Fielding, Raven) Modified text/link on 4/2/2021 (pp). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Attachment was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (cwa) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2021-00808 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8765286) filed by Tri-State Rock & Rails, LLC, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Notice of Compliance, #3 Proposed Pleading Certification of Service, #4 Proposed Pleading Verification, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Raven Fielding added to party National Liability & Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Raven Fielding added to party Tri-State Rock & Rails, LLC(pty:dft).(Fielding, Raven) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/8/2021) (cwa). Modified text on 3/8/2021 (cwa). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL LIABILITY AND FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward J. Womac, Jr.