This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:46:01 (UTC).

Shavers v. Wess et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Shavers filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wess. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Shavers #378021

Kincheloe, MI 49784

Defendants

Unknown Parties

Bill Wess

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: lack of prosecution and failure to comply; Plaintiff's custodial agent to collect and remit filing fee; no good-faith basis for appeal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#9

(#9) OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10143; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SOso) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Michael Shavers; with prison account statement. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee or fee waiver form. Correction due by 3/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

1 #1

Document Continuation

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Shavers against John Doe, Bill Wess (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/18/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Judgment Dismissing Case #12 , Order Dismissing Case (no motion) #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Shavers (slk) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: lack of prosecution and failure to comply; Plaintiff's custodial agent to collect and remit filing fee; no good-faith basis for appeal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #10 , Opinion (Screening) #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Shavers (slk) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Shavers #378021 (ns) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10143; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SOso) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Deficiency corrected re #4 Order. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Michael Shavers; with prison account statement. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee or fee waiver form. Correction due by 3/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Mediation Program (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Shavers against John Doe, Bill Wess (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less