This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2020 at 08:13:30 (UTC).

Shatar Capital Inc v. Farzaneh

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Shatar Capital Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Farzaneh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01057

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shatar Capital Inc

Defendant

Amir M Farzaneh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary A Bryant

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Evan G E Vincent

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorney

Geoffrey A Tabor

Attorney at Ward & Glass LLP

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Exhibit Verified Petition for Damages and Injunction - Cleveland County Case

7 #1

Exhibit Second Amended Petition - Cleveland County Case

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Guaranty Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - 1005 LLC Promissory Note

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Shatar Capital Inc. (Vincent, Evan) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/23/2020. (ks) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Joe Heaton no longer assigned to case. For future filings the letters at the end of the case number should be "PRW". Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/19/2020. (lam) Modified on 11/19/2020 (lam). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Shatar Capital Inc . (Bryant, Gary) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively, Motion to Remand to State Court by Amir M Farzaneh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Petition - Cleveland County Case, #2 Exhibit Verified Petition for Damages and Injunction - Cleveland County Case)(Tabor, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey A Tabor on behalf of Amir M Farzaneh (Tabor, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shatar Capital Inc. Amir M Farzaneh served on 10/23/2020. (Vincent, Evan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Amir M Farzaneh. (knt) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Evan G E Vincent on behalf of Shatar Capital Inc (Vincent, Evan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Gary A Bryant on behalf of Shatar Capital Inc (Bryant, Gary) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3336755. (Vincent, Evan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amir M Farzaneh filed by Shatar Capital Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1005 LLC Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Guaranty Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan G E Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Alvin Bryant