This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2020 at 08:50:26 (UTC).

Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC et al v. American Highland Cattle Association

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against American Highland Cattle Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is John M. Conroy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John M. Conroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ray Shatney

Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC

Janet Steward

Defendant

American Highland Cattle Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robin A. Freeman, Esq.

Attorney at Earle & Freeman, PLC

107 State Street, P.O. 1385

Montpelier, VT 05601-1385

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: American Highland Cattle Association waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020.(Freeman, Robin) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC, Ray Shatney, Janet Steward (Freeman, Robin) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: American Highland Cattle Association waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020.(Freeman, Robin) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC, Ray Shatney, Janet Steward (Freeman, Robin) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Highland Cattle Association filed by Shat Acres Highland Cattle, LLC, Janet Steward, Ray Shatney. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less