This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:46:28 (UTC).

Bradley D. Sharp v. Shinhan Bank Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Bradley D Sharp filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Shinhan Bank Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09197

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradley D. Sharp

Defendants

SHINHAN BANK CO., LTD.

KOOKMIN BANK CO., LTD.

KOREA SECURITIES FINANCE CORPORATION

GOLDENBRIDGE ASSET MANAGEMENT CO., LTD.

JB ASSET MANAGEMENT CO., LTD.

KOREA ALTERNATIVE INVESTMENT ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #1

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #2

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #3

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #4

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #5

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #6

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #7

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #8

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #9

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #10

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #11

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #12

GB US FINTECH INCOME FUND OF FUNDS #13

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Allen Castleman

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kathy Bazoian Phelps

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DOCKET NO. 1-68 filed by Permanent Receiver Bradley D. Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68)(Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-02188 DSF(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09197 DSF(MRWx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 1, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 10, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 11, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 12, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 13, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 14, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 15, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 16, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 2, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 3, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 4, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 5, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 6, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 7, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 8, GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds No. 9, Goldenbridge Asset Management Co., Ltd., JB Asset Management Co., Ltd., JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 1, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 10, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 11, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 12, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 2, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 3, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 4, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 5, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 6, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 7, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 8, JB US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 9, KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 1, KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 3, KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 4, KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 5, KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of Funds No. 9, Kookmin Bank Co., Ltd., Korea Alternative Investment Asset Management Corporation, Korea Securities Finance Corporation, Shinhan Bank Co., Ltd. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Allen Castleman counsel for Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp. Adding David A. Castleman as counsel of record for Bradley D. Sharp, as Receiver for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp. (Attorney David Allen Castleman added to party Bradley D. Sharp(pty:pla))(Castleman, David) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-2188-DSF-MRW; 2:21-cv-9183 (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp, identifying DIRECT LENDING INVESTMENTS, LLC, DIRECT LENDING INCOME FUND, L.P., DIRECT LENDING INCOME FEEDER FUND, LTD., DLI CAPITAL, INC., DLI LENDING AGENT, LLC DLI ASSETS BRAVO, LLC; Development Specialists, Inc.; Shinhan Bank Co., Ltd.; Shinhan Financial Group Co., Ltd.; Kookmin Bank Co., Ltd.; KB Financial Group, Inc; Korea Securities Finance Corporation; Goldenbridge Asset Management Co., Ltd.;Sangsangin Co., Ltd.;JB Asset Management Co., Ltd.;JB Financial Group Co., Ltd.;Korea Alternative Investment Asset Management Corporation;GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #1;GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #2;GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #3;GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #4; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #5; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #6; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #7; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #8; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #9; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #10; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #11; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #12; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #13; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #14; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #15; GB US Fintech Income Fund of Funds #16; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #1; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #2; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #3; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #4; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #5; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #6; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #7; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #8; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #9; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #10; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #11; JB US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #12; KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #1; KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #3; KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #4; KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #5; KAIC US Fin-Tech Fund of funds #9. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32379074 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68) (Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Bradley D. Sharp(pty:pla))(Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOOKMIN BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where SHINHAN BANK AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Allen Castleman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathy Bazoian Phelps