This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2019 at 07:48:31 (UTC).

Sharp v. Fluke et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Sharp filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Fluke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Veronica L. Duffy and Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04173

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Veronica L. Duffy

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anthony Keenan Sharp

Yankton, SD 57075

Respondents

Warden Fluke

Jason Ravnsborg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Sherri Sundem Wald

Attorney at Attorney General of South Dakota

1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1, 773-3215, Fax: 773-4106

Pierre, SD 57501-8501

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 MOTION to DISMISS , #11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 11/18/2019. (CG) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

11 #2

Request for Admission

11 #1

Request for Production

#11

(#11) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Request for Production, #2 Request for Admission) (SLW) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/15/2019) (SLW). (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#10

(#10) SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Anthony Keenan Sharp re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (SLW) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Fluke, Jason Ravnsborg. (Wald, Sherri) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to DISMISS by Fluke, Jason Ravnsborg. (Wald, Sherri) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR SERVICE AND TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/8/2019. (CG) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel (document was in middle of the attachments) by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Attachments

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SLW) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • Filing Fee Received from Anthony Keenan Sharp. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003352. (MSB) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 MOTION to DISMISS , #11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 11/18/2019. (CG) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Request for Production, #2 Request for Admission) (SLW) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/15/2019) (SLW). (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Anthony Keenan Sharp re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (SLW) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • RECEIVED Minnehaha County Clerk of Courts: Criminal cases 14-8084 and 15-4360; Civil case 18-157. Supreme Court Records 27927 and 28026. The records are located on Clerk of Court N Drive. (SLW) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Fluke, Jason Ravnsborg. (Wald, Sherri) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to DISMISS by Fluke, Jason Ravnsborg. (Wald, Sherri) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR SERVICE AND TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/8/2019. (CG) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel (document was in middle of the attachments) by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 together with a Prisoner Trust Account Report. Although a new case has been opened, you need to complete the enclosed Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Copy of docket sheet and IFP Motion sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLW) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLW) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SLW) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.