This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 08:28:10 (UTC).

SHARMA v. LIU

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 SHARMA filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against LIU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-20268

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PANKAJ SHARMA

Defendant

VIVIAN LIU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAMUEL B. FINEMAN, ESQ.

Attorney at Cohen Fineman LLC

Five Greentree Centre, Suite 104, 525 Route 73 North

Marlton, NJ 08053

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL SZALKIEWICZ

Attorney at DANIEL SZALKIEWICZ & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

116 Pinehurst Avenue, Suite A44

New York, NY 10033

 

Court Documents

7 #3

Exhibit ExC

7 #2

Exhibit ExB

7 #1

Exhibit ExA

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT of PANKAJ SHARMA against VIVIAN LIU, filed by PANKAJ SHARMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExA, #2 Exhibit ExB, #3 Exhibit ExC)(FINEMAN, SAMUEL) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

6 #8

Exhibit 5

6 #6

Exhibit 3

6 #5

Exhibit 2

6 #3

Brief Memorandum of Law

6 #2

Certification Certification

6 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Defendant

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and R.12(b)(6) by VIVIAN LIU. Responses due by 2/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Defendant, #2 Certification Certification, #3 Brief Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Pankaj Sharma on 12/29/2020, filed by VIVIAN LIU. (SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1-5

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VIVIAN LIU from Middlesex County, case number MID-L-007458-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11871696), filed by VIVIAN LIU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT of PANKAJ SHARMA against VIVIAN LIU, filed by PANKAJ SHARMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExA, #2 Exhibit ExB, #3 Exhibit ExC)(FINEMAN, SAMUEL) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and R.12(b)(6). Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and R.12(b)(6) by VIVIAN LIU. Responses due by 2/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Defendant, #2 Certification Certification, #3 Brief Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant's January 7, 2021 letter [D.E. 4]. Concerning Defendant's request to file a motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), a pre-motion conference is unnecessary, as Rule 12 already entitles Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, including by way of a Rule 12 motion. Defendant's deadline to do so is governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/8/2021. (MAH) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from Daniel Szalkiewicz. (SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 3/29/2021. Dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/29/2020. (jqb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Pankaj Sharma on 12/29/2020, filed by VIVIAN LIU. (SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Removal-Other Court Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VIVIAN LIU from Middlesex County, case number MID-L-007458-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11871696), filed by VIVIAN LIU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SZALKIEWICZ, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMUEL B. FINEMAN, ESQ.(Designation Retained)