This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2021 at 06:17:44 (UTC).

Sharma v. Amazon Web Services Inc

Case Summary

On October 11, 2021, Ashutosh Sharma (“Sharma” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Daryl J. Sinkule of Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC, filed a civil right lawsuit against Amazon Web Services, Inc. (“Amazon” or “Defendant”), seeking back pay, front pay, compensatory damages, attorneys’ fees, costs and pre-judgment and post-judgment interest for the alleged discrimination on the basis of age, national origin, race, and disability, in the course of his employment with Defendant. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of Texas with Judge A. Joe Fish presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Sharma began his employment with Defendant as a Level 6 Senior Technical Account Manager (“TAM”) in Enterprise Support in Defendant’s DFW office on or about November 12, 2018. He is from India, speaks with an accent, and is 45 years old. Sharma initially reported to Art Cuellar. However, within five (5) weeks or so of the commencement of his employment, as a result of company reorganization, Sharma began reporting to Pieter Loggenberg (“Loggenberg”), who is Caucasian and was at that time 40 years old.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “After Sharma reported Loggenberg, Sharma’s high-profile customers were taken away. Higher profile customers were given to Hall. Loggenberg continued to deny Sharma’s training requests, and trainings that had been scheduled previously were cancelled or postponed. Sharma’s employee benefits discount was cancelled. Although Sharma attempted to leave Loggenberg’s group, applying for over 62 other positions at Defendant, Loggenberg thwarted Sharma’s efforts, providing Sharma with a negative reference, in retaliation for Sharma lodging discrimination and retaliation complaints against Loggenberg.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “On September 30, 2019, Defendant terminated Sharma’s employment.” “At all times, Sharma was qualified for the position that he held with Defendant, as well as the other positions for which he applied at Defendant.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out six claims for relief. The first claim is for alleged Age Discrimination under Chapter 21 of the Texas Labor Code. The second claim is for alleged National Origin Discrimination under Chapter 21 of the Texas Labor Code. The third claim is for alleged Disability Discrimination under Chapter 21 of the Texas Labor Code. The fourth claim is for alleged Retaliation under Chapter 21 of the Texas Labor Code. The fifth claim alleged is for violation of Section 1981, Section 1981A and the Civil Rights Act of 1991. Lastly, the sixth claim alleged is for exemplary damages.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to grant him appropriate back pay, including but not limited to, his salary, bonuses, benefits, reinstatement, or if reinstatement is deemed not feasible, front pay, including his salary, bonuses, and benefits, mental anguish and emotional distress in the past and the future; compensatory damages; punitive damages as allowed by law; reasonable attorneys’ fees both for the trial of this cause and any and all appeals as may be necessary; together with costs of litigation and pre-judgment and post-judgment interest as allowed by law, including taxable court costs. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02486

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashutosh Sharma

Defendant

Amazon Web Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daryl J Sinkule

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore, PLLC

3109 Carlisle Street

Dallas, TX 75204-1194

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ashutosh Sharma. (Sinkule, Daryl) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Amazon Web Services Inc filed by Ashutosh Sharma. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12290510) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Sinkule, Daryl) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daryl John Sinkule