This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 20:51:56 (UTC).

SharkNinja Operating LLC v. iRobot Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 SharkNinja Operating LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against iRobot Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12236

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

SharkNinja Operating LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

iRobot Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht, & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Alissa K. Lipton

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Two Seaport Lane, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02210-2001

Daniel C. Tucker

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Two Freedom Square, 11955 Freedom Drive

Reston, VA 20190

Doris Johnson Hines

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garett & Dunner, LLP

1300 I Street, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Brian A. Rosenthal

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0193

Jaysen S. Chung

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn, and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Erika Harmon Arner

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Two Freedom Square, 11955 Freedom Drive,

Reston, VA 20190

Kathleen A. Daley

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Luke McCammon

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

H. Mark Lyon

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1530 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Anders P. Fjellstedt

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Gregg F Locascio

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

John W. Shaw

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Peter E. Gelhaar

Attorney at Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

260 Franklin Street, Suite 1600

Boston, MA 02110

Timothy H. Madden

Attorney at Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Suite 1600, 260 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110

Sean McEldowney

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Robin A McCue

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

C. Alex Shank

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed with Jury Demand against iRobot Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2753613.) - filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-K

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,418,303 B2 ;8,950,038 B2 ;9,104,204 B2 ;9,223,749 B2 ;9,492,048 B2 ;9,529,363 B2 ;9,550,294 B2. (See attached for additional Patents). (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent EP Midco LLC for SharkNinja Operating LLC filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. iRobot Corporation served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#8) DECLARATION re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation -- Declaration of Jack B. Blumenfeld -- by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#7

(#7) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#49

(#49) Plaintiff SharkNinja's ANSWER to Counterclaim by SharkNinja Operating LLC.(Lipton, Alissa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

48 #13

Exhibit M

48 #12

Exhibit L

48 #9

Exhibit I

48 #8

Exhibit H

48 #11

Exhibit K

48 #10

Exhibit J

48 #5

Exhibit E

48 #4

Exhibit D

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Plaintiff SharkNinja's ANSWER to Counterclaim by SharkNinja Operating LLC.(Lipton, Alissa) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Defendant iRobot's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against SharkNinja Operating LLC by iRobot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Madden, Timothy) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against SharkNinja Operating LLC, filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '303 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '038 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '048 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '294 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '676 Patent)(Lipton, Alissa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Lipton, Alissa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE by iRobot Corporation of Withdrawal of Appearance of John W. Shaw (Madden, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kathleen A. Daley and Jaysen S. Chung. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kathleen A. Daley and Jaysen S. Chung Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7964585 by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lipton, Alissa) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sean M. McEldowney. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian Rosenthal, Hervey Mark Lyon, Doris Johnson Hines, Luke McCammon, Erika Harmon Arner and Daniel C. Tucker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECLARATION re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation -- Declaration of Jack B. Blumenfeld -- by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/1/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Enjoin Duplicative Litigation - filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. iRobot Corporation served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to iRobot Corporation on 10/15/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent EP Midco LLC for SharkNinja Operating LLC filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,418,303 B2 ;8,950,038 B2 ;9,104,204 B2 ;9,223,749 B2 ;9,492,048 B2 ;9,529,363 B2 ;9,550,294 B2. (See attached for additional Patents). (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - filed with Jury Demand against iRobot Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2753613.) - filed by SharkNinja Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.