This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 07:10:49 (UTC).

Shapiro v. Department of Labor

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Shapiro filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Department of Labor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01425

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Shapiro

New York, NY 10103

Defendant

Department of Labor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER. The complaint #1 is stricken without prejudice to an amended complaint, to be filed within 28 days. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. [For further details see order.] Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/3/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Robert Shapiro for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint by Robert Shapiro. (Exhibits) (jh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER. The complaint #1 is stricken without prejudice to an amended complaint, to be filed within 28 days. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. [For further details see order.] Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/3/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Robert Shapiro for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint by Robert Shapiro. (Exhibits) (jh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less