This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:36:05 (UTC).

Shapiro v. United States Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Shapiro filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christina Reiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina Reiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert E. Shapiro

Defendants

Commissioner of Social Security

United States Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily J. Joselson, Esq.

Attorney at Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP

111 South Pleasant Street, P.O. Drawer 351

Middlebury, VT 05753-0351

Justin G. Sherman, Esq.

Attorney at Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP

111 South Pleasant Street, P.O. Drawer 351

Middlebury, VT 05753-0351

Defendant Attorney

Jason M. Turner, AUSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 570

Burlington, VT 05402-0570

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin G. Sherman, Esq. on behalf of Robert E. Shapiro. (pac) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by United States Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Acknowledgment/Acceptance of Service filed by Robert E. Shapiro. Docket text has been clarified to read United States Social Security Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (jlh) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. United States Social Security Administration served on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherman, Justin) Answer due date corrected on 1/16/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin G. Sherman, Esq. on behalf of Robert E. Shapiro. (pac) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Social Security Administration filed by Robert E. Shapiro. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) Deft name clarified on 12/23/2019 (law). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less