This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 07:04:18 (UTC).

Shapiro v. About.com

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Shapiro filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against About com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis, Robert M. Levy and Carol Bagley Amon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03813

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

Presiding Judges

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Carol Bagley Amon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Shapiro

Defendant

About.com, Inc. doing business as Dotdash

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. Blit

Attorney at Levine & Blit, PLLC

350 Fifth Avenue - Suite 6902

New York, NY 10118

Defendant Attorney

Sima Kazmir

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

200 Park Avenue, 52Nd Floor

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Keith Shapiro (Blit, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABOUT.COM from Supreme Court of the State of New York - Kings County, case number 509690/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13240684) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kazmir, Sima) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Keith Shapiro (Blit, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon for all further proceedings. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/31/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABOUT.COM from Supreme Court of the State of New York - Kings County, case number 509690/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13240684) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kazmir, Sima) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where About, Inc. doing business as Dotdash is a litigant