This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2020 at 10:19:57 (UTC).

Shannon v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 Shannon filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Medical Data Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard W. Story and J. Clay Fuller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Shannon

Defendant

Medical Data Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Shannon. Medical Data Systems, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

#4

(#4) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Amanda Shannon. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#2

(#2) GENERAL ORDER 20-01 AMENDED IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/2020. (dgr) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amanda Shannon. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9614282) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Shannon. Medical Data Systems, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 05/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Amanda Shannon. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) GENERAL ORDER 20-01 AMENDED IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/2020. (dgr) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amanda Shannon. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9614282) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less