This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 08:15:11 (UTC).

Shannon v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Shannon filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01192

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Shannon

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua R. Goodbaum

Attorney at Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC

405 Orange St.

New Haven, CT 06511

Elisabeth Lee

Attorney at Garrison, Levin-Epstein, Fitzgerald & Pirrotti, P.C.

405 Orange Street

New Haven, CT 06511

Nina Therese Pirrotti

Attorney at Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC

405 Orange St.

New Haven, CT 06511

Defendant Attorneys

Lori B. Alexander

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.- NH, CT

One Century Tower, Suite 300, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

Lindsay M. Rinehart

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

265 Church Street, Ste 300

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

#19

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Identification of Initial Discovery Protocol for Employment Cases

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. to 10/23/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/23/2020 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/14/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 10/7/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Security for Costs by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay M. Rinehart on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Rinehart, Lindsay) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Alexander on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Alexander, Lori) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020 filed by Richard Shannon. (Goodbaum, Joshua) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Lee on behalf of Richard Shannon [PLAINTIFF's NAME CORRECTED] (Lee, Elisabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Goodbaum on behalf of Richard Shannon [PLAINTIFF's NAME CORRECTED] (Goodbaum, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Identification of Initial Discovery Protocol for Employment Cases) (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020, Discovery due by 2/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Lee on behalf of Richard Shannon (Lee, Elisabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Goodbaum on behalf of Richard Shannon (Goodbaum, Joshua) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Therese Pirrotti on behalf of Richard Shannon (Pirrotti, Nina) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Pirrotti, Nina) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6035893.), filed by Richard Shannon.(Pirrotti, Nina) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori B. Alexander