This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2022 at 09:34:24 (UTC).

Shannon v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Shannon filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark S. Norris and Annie T. Christoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02370

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenya Shannon

Defendant

Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Defendant Attorney

Courtney Leyes

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP - Memphis

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 312

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A- Kenya Shannon Consent to Join

1 #3

Summons to be Issued

#2

(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Kenya Shannon (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Leyes on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux North America, Inc. for Electrolux Home Products, Inc... (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenya Shannon. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Kenya Shannon of Consent to Join of Cedric Green and Theresa White (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Kenya Shannon of Consent to Join of Cedric Green and Theresa White (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenya Shannon. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux North America, Inc. for Electrolux Home Products, Inc... (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Leyes on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Leyes, Courtney) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Kenya Shannon (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (btg) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3897417), filed by Kenya Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Kenya Shannon Consent to Join, #3 Summons to be Issued)(Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant