This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:10:56 (UTC).

SHANNON et al v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 SHANNON filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFREY SHANNON

KELLY A. SHANNON

Defendants

TRANS UNION L.L.C

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Equifax Information Services LLC

Hilton Resorts Corporation

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

JPMorgan Chase Bank

Bank of America Corporation

N.A. Citibank

Discover Bank

ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP

Trans Union L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRENT F. VULLINGS

Attorney at Vullings Law Group, LLC

3953 Ridge Pike, Suite 102

Collegeville, PA 19426

Erik-Anthony W Fox

Attorney at Cogburn Law Offices

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL F ROTHENBERG

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES, O.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

CASEY GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF, PINCUS & GREEN, P.C.

1101 Market Street, 2700 Aramark Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19107

CHRISTOPHER M HUNCHUCK

Attorney at Jones Day - Pittsburgh

500 Grant St, Suite 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2514

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

The Curtis Center, Suite 400E, 170 S. Independence Mall, W.

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3337

JAKOB F. WILLIAMS

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Ste 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MARTIN C. BRYCE, JR.

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR ANDREWS AND INGERSOLL, L.L.P.

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Andrew Clark

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

JENNA C. HUTCHINSON

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP

875 Third Ave

New York, NY 10022

A. MICHAEL PRATT

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

1717 Arch Street, Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Christiana L. Signs

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1717 Arch St., Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GEORGE J. FARRELL

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

1717 Arch Street, Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GREGORY E. DAPPER

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS LLP

260 Forbes Avenue, 18Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

MICHAEL FAUSEY

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

1735 Market St 51St Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR ANDREWS & INGERSOLL, LLP

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

AARON R. EASLEY

Attorney at SESSIONS FISHMAN NATHAN & ISRAEL LLC

3 Cross Creek Dr

Flemington, NJ 08822-4938

 

Court Documents

#79

(#79) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Clark on behalf of Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#78

(#78) ORDER Granting #77 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Brent F. Vullings and approving Designation of Local Counsel Erik-Anthony W Fox. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/8/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#77

(#77) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brent F. Vullings, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Erik W. Fox, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6788304) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Shannon, Kelly A. Shannon. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#76

(#76) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erik-Anthony W Fox on behalf of Plaintiffs JEFFREY SHANNON, KELLY A. SHANNON. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

74 #1

*Restricted*

#74

(#74) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-03875. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

56 #5

Exhibit 3 to Declaration

56 #4

Exhibit 2 to Declaration

33 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Affidavit of Service Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON re: Rocco Morisco served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) Modified on 9/10/2021 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/3/21. 9/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, CITIBANK, N.A., DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15371641.), filed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Clark on behalf of Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Clark, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER Granting #77 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Brent F. Vullings and approving Designation of Local Counsel Erik-Anthony W Fox. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/8/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brent F. Vullings, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Erik W. Fox, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6788304) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Shannon, Kelly A. Shannon. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erik-Anthony W Fox on behalf of Plaintiffs JEFFREY SHANNON, KELLY A. SHANNON. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/4/2022. (no image attached) (HAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-03875. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CITIBANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO COMPEL #50 IS GRANTED FOR THE REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. DEFENDANT DISCOVER BANK'S MOTION TO COMPEL #56 IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT CITIBANK, N.A.'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #33 IS DENIED AS MOOT. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT DISCOVER BANK'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #46 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANT HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #54 IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF #64 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/19/22.1/19/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT ANY THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY 2/17/22. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 9/23/22. EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 10/21/22. MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ARE DUE BY 2/17/22. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 6/9/23. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/9/22. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/9/23. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/9/23. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 7/17/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 1/19/22. 1/19/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Motion Hearing held on 1/18/22 re #46 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT DISCOVER BANKS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE NUMBER 7 filed by KELLY A. SHANNON, #63 MOTION re #54 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, #33 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT CITIBANKS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE NUMBER 7 filed by JEFFREY SHANNON, KELLY A. SHANNON, #50 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by CITIBANK, N.A., #54 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, #56 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by DISCOVER BANK Court Reporter: ESR. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON re: Kathy Anderson served Summons and Complaint upon WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. by personal service. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON re: Dennis Davis served Summons and Complaint upon HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION by personal service. HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON re: Teresa Bailly served Summons and Complaint upon CITIBANK, N.A. by personal service. CITIBANK, N.A. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON re: Rocco Morisco served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) Modified on 9/10/2021 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/3/21. 9/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, CITIBANK, N.A., DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/1/21 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, CITIBANK, N.A., DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, TRANS UNION, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15371641.), filed by KELLY A. SHANNON, JEFFREY SHANNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/21/2022.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N.A. Citibank is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilton Resorts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant