This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 11:04:44 (UTC).

Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd v. Mengku Technology Co., Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Mengku Technology Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05209

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd

Defendants

Mengku Technology Co., Ltd

Qianan Li

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shan Zhu

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 11G-2

Flushing, NY 11354

Defendant Attorneys

Jigang Jin

Attorney at Jin Law Firm

Po Box 1937, Union City

Union City, CA 94587

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman LLP

1 Penn Plz, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

30 #2

Appendix certificate of good standing

30 #1

Affidavit in Support pro hac vice

#30

#29

24 #2

Declaration in Support of EMERGENCY MOTION OF MENGKU TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. AND QI

#24

19 #2

Exhibit Proposed Ji Decl.

19 #1

Exhibit Proposed Zhu Decl.

#19

#5

1 #4

Exhibit D's Unauthorized Use

1 #3

Exhibit P's Use

1 #2

Exhibit D's Unauthorized Use

1 #1

Exhibit Fed. Reg.

#1

#4

#3

#2

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jigang Jin Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13886102. by Qianan Li, Mengku Technology Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support pro hac vice, #2 Appendix certificate of good standing) (Jin, Jigang) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MEMORANDUM & ORDER terminating #24 Motion to Vacate; terminating #19 Motion for Leave to File; denying #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. 19) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate all pending motions as MOOT. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/18/2020. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joanna Seybert: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2020 re Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd. Motion denied. Written decision to be entered. (Court Reporter Dominick Tursi.) (Russo, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #24 MOTION to Vacate #20 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,, Temporary Restraining Order,,,,,,,, filed by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd. (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,, Temporary Restraining Order,,,,,,,, filed by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd. (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Letter of Clarification regarding Answering Papers for Order to Show Cause by Qianan Li, Mengku Technology Co., Ltd (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Vacate #20 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,, Temporary Restraining Order,,,,,,,, by Qianan Li, Mengku Technology Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support EMERGENCY MOTION OF MENGKU TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. AND QIANAN LI TO DISSOLVE THE EX PARTE TRO, #2 Declaration in Support of EMERGENCY MOTION OF MENGKU TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. AND QIANAN LI TO DISSOLVE THE EX PARTE TRO) (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd re #20 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,, Temporary Restraining Order,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit supporting doc.) (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATUS REPORT re: service of complaint by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request to MOJ of PRC, #2 Exhibit Summary of doc. to be ser.) (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , 15 1 - Exparte Docket Entry AND Document CV,, Affidavit in Support of Motion, 17 1 - Exparte Docket Entry AND Document CV, Memorandum in Support, #12 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #11 Memorandum in Support, #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #18 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION for Leave to File Document renewed motion for TRO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 MOTION for Service by Publication alternative service by email, #20 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,, Temporary Restraining Order,,,,,,,, 16 1 - Exparte Docket Entry AND Document CV, Affidavit in Support of Motion (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketIncorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was filed as against plaintiff. Entry was deleted and refiled as against defendants. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13615191 (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Qianan Li, Mengku Technology Co., Ltd Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fed. Reg., #2 Exhibit D's Unauthorized Use, #3 Exhibit P's Use, #4 Exhibit D's Unauthorized Use) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 11/2/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd (Zhu, Shan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet Re #1 Complaint, by Shanghai Zhenglang Technology Co., Ltd (Zhu, Shan) Modified on 11/2/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen