This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:34:26 (UTC).

SHANER v. LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SHANER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05752

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARVEY M. SHANER, JR.

Allentown, PA 18102

Defendants

KLYE RUSSELL

JANINE DONATE

CAROL SOMMERS

LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JANINE DONATE, LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON, KLYE RUSSELL, CAROL SOMMERS, filed by HARVEY M. SHANER, JR. (NO IFP FILED, NO FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Designation Form , CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Copy of Order/Notice dated 12/5/19 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Harvey M. Shaner, Jr. for the following reason: Return to Sender. (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF HARVEY M. SHANER, JR., SHALL HAVE UNTIL 2/23/2020 TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S 12/10/2019 ORDER WHICH WAS RESENT TO HIM ON 1/22/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/23/2020. 1/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT IF SHANER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER (1) PAY $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IF SHANER IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY $350 FILING FEE INSTALLMENTS, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH SHANER WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/10/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO SHANER. *STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER SENT TO SHANER ON 12/10/19*(rf, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY HARVEY M. SHANER, JR.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF HARVEY M. SHANER, JR., SHALL HAVE UNTIL 2/23/2020 TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S 12/10/2019 ORDER WHICH WAS RESENT TO HIM ON 1/22/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/23/2020. 1/27/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • COPY OF COURT ORDER (DOC. 3) AND STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER FORWARDED TO HARVEY M. SHANER, JR AT THE FEDERAL DETENTION CENTER PHILADELPHIA ON 1/21/20. (rf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Copy of Order/Notice dated 12/5/19 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Harvey M. Shaner, Jr. for the following reason: Return to Sender. (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER THAT IF SHANER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER EITHER (1) PAY $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. IF SHANER IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY $350 FILING FEE INSTALLMENTS, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH SHANER WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/10/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO SHANER. *STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER SENT TO SHANER ON 12/10/19*(rf, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JANINE DONATE, LEHIGH COUNTY PRISON, KLYE RUSSELL, CAROL SOMMERS, filed by HARVEY M. SHANER, JR. (NO IFP FILED, NO FEE PAID) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.