Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 12:33:40 (UTC).

Shane Kisman v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Shane Kisman filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna, Charles F. Eick and Andre Birotte Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03164

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judges

James V. Selna

Andre Birotte Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shane Kisman

Defendant

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary Michael Cantor

Attorney at Cantor Law

1112 Montana Avenue Suite C

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Defendant Attorneys

David Wesley Ammons

Attorney at LTL Attorneys LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julia Levitskaia

Attorney at LTL Attorneys LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dylan A Farmer

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard LLP

8000 Ih 10 West Suite 1600

San Antonio, TX 78230

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Christine E Reinhard on behalf of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., will not be appearing. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (sbou) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Attorney Julia Levitskaia added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Levitskaia, Julia) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dylan A. Farmer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christine E. Reinhard. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03164 AB (Ex). (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman, (Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman. (Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31103862 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman. (Attorney Zachary Michael Cantor added to party Shane Kisman(pty:pla))(Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Christine E Reinhard on behalf of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., will not be appearing. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (sbou) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dylan A. Farmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31450660) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Levitskaia, Julia) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Shane Kisman in support of Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer venue)(Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware). (Attorney Julia Levitskaia added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Levitskaia, Julia) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dylan A. Farmer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christine E. Reinhard. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney David Wesley Ammons added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Ammons, David) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03164 AB (Ex). (esa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman, (Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman. (Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31103862 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Shane Kisman. (Attorney Zachary Michael Cantor added to party Shane Kisman(pty:pla))(Cantor, Zachary) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant