This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 10:32:07 (UTC).

Shane Douglas Sichting v. Patricia V. Bradley

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Shane Douglas Sichting filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Patricia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08142

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shane Douglas Sichting

Lompoc, CA 93436

Respondent

Patricia V. Bradley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Petitioners Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #6 filed by Petitioner Shane Douglas Sichting. (es) Modified on 10/27/2020 (es). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

6 #3

Proof of Service

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Declaration of Suzanne Scott

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by respondent Patricia V. Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzanne Scott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Pinchas, David) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Respondent Patricia V. Bradley. Adding David Pinchas as counsel of record for Patricia V. Bradley for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Patricia V. Bradley. (Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Patricia V. Bradley(pty:res))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

3 #2

Blank Consent Form

3 #1

Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent must file and serve a notice of appearance. Respondent should file a motion to dismiss within 30 days of the date of this Order. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Blank Consent Form) (et) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Petitioners Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #6 filed by Petitioner Shane Douglas Sichting. (es) Modified on 10/27/2020 (es). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by respondent Patricia V. Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzanne Scott, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Pinchas, David) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#5) FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Shane Douglas Sichting. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 . Receipt number LA212142. (fr) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Respondent Patricia V. Bradley. Adding David Pinchas as counsel of record for Patricia V. Bradley for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Patricia V. Bradley. (Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Patricia V. Bradley(pty:res))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent must file and serve a notice of appearance. Respondent should file a motion to dismiss within 30 days of the date of this Order. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Blank Consent Form) (et) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111) (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), filed by Petitioner Shane Douglas Sichting. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas