This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 08:29:21 (UTC).

Shamrock Wings, LLC v. Sterling National Bank et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 Shamrock Wings, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sterling National Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra M. Brown and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shamrock Wings, LLC

Defendants

Sterling National Bank

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Derek D. Hopson

Attorney at HOPSON LAW GROUP

P.O. Box 266, Martin Luther King Blvd.

Clarksdale, MS 38614

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2058517, filed by Shamrock Wings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Sterling National Bank waiver sent on 2/16/2022. (Hopson, Derek)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to United States of America (jla)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to United States of America (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Sterling National Bank waiver sent on 2/16/2022. (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2058517, filed by Shamrock Wings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STERLING NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek D. Hopson